MA H4336 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative McMurtry of Dedham and Senator Rush, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul McMurtry and Michael F. Rush establishing a sick leave bank for Gloria Phillips, an employee of the Department of Industrial Accidents. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Gloria Phillips, an employee of the Division of Industrial Accidents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-06-19 | House | Enacted |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-06-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-06-14 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Read third |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-14 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-04-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4336 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4336.pdf |