MA H4314 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michael A. Daigle, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michael A. Daigle, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4321 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-12-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4321 (Replaced by) 2020-02-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4314 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4314.pdf |