MA H4309 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Instituting saltwater fishing licenses.
Title
INSTITUTING SALTWATER FISHING LICENSES.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2009 | |
2009-11-17 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2009-11-17 | Enacted | |
2009-11-17 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | |
2009-11-17 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-10 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-11-10 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-10 | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in s2200 | |
2009-11-10 | Read second | |
2009-11-10 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-10 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of s2200 | |
2009-11-05 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-11-04 | Passed to be engrossed 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement, | |
2009-11-04 | Amendment laid aside on a point of order | |
2009-11-04 | Amendment pending | |
2009-11-04 | Read third (title changed) | |
2009-11-04 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-04 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-04 | Substituted for H4224 | |
2009-11-04 | Pending new draft for H4224 | |
2009-11-04 | Reported from the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4309 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7895&generalCourtId=2 |