MA H4277 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Springfield be authorized to convert the use of park land at DeBerry Park for a new DeBerry and Homer Street elementary school and to replace it with additional park land in said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Springfield to convert the use of park land at DeBerry Park for a new DeBerry and Homer Street Elementary School and to replace it with additional park land in the city of Springfield

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-01-23HouseRules suspended
2020-01-23HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-01-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-12-30SenateSenate concurred
2019-12-26HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H2953 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1846 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1790 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3464 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1808 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback