MA H4268 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1934

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To create a Massachusetts rare disease advisory council

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create a Massachusetts rare disease advisory council

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-12-26HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-12-26HouseNew draft of H1934
2019-12-26HouseReported from the committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1934 (Replaces) 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4268
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
S2134 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback