MA H4265 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4625
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect victims of rape and children conceived during the commission of said offense. The Judiciary.
Title
To protect victims of rape and children conceived during the commission of said offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4625 |
2016-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2016 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4625 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1930 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3527 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H3410 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H3392 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
H3411 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Accompanied H3412
H1930 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3527 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H3410 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H3392 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
H3411 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Accompanied H3412
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4265 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4265.pdf |