MA H426 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4585

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to implementing automated emergency response communications and coordination between schools with first responders. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing automated emergency response communications and coordination between Massachusetts schools with first responders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4585
2023-11-02JointHearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H4585 (Replaced by) 2024-05-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2036 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1823 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S1463 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
S1636 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Accompanied H2528
H2354 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback