MA H426 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4880

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to continuing education requirements for electricians. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding requirements for continuing education for electricians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-30HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4880
2021-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H2215 (Similar To) 2021-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2579 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S202 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
H4880 (Replaced by) 2022-06-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback