MA H4233 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1523
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying occupancy excise and internet hotel room resellers
Title
Clarifying occupancy excise and internet hotel room resellers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2016-05-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-05 | House | New draft of S1523, H2515 and H2539 |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1523 (Replaces) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4233
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4233 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4233.pdf |