MA H4217 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4153
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the right to time off for voting
Title
Protecting the right to time off for voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-12-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-12-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-14 | House | New draft of H4153 |
2023-12-14 | House | Pending new draft of H4153 |
2023-12-14 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4153 (Replaces) 2023-12-14 - New draft substituted, see H4217
H1912 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4153
H1912 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4153
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4217 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4217.pdf |