MA H4208 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to establish a program to provide certain tenants and entities the right to purchase the residential property in which the tenants reside when that residential property is being offered for sale. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Somerville to enact Right to Purchase Legislation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 8, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1371 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H761 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H2136 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
S1734 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2021
S1340 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2021
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - New draft (Jehlen) substituted, see S3129
H761 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H2136 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
S1734 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2021
S1340 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2021
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - New draft (Jehlen) substituted, see S3129
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4208 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4208.pdf |