MA H4204 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4348
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to power Massachusetts’s clean energy economy.
Title
To power Massachusetts’s clean energy economy
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4348 |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1229 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S258 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
H2016 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
H3294 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
S2167 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2232 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1197 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
H4348 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
H1954 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
S2193 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H602 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1229 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S258 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
H2016 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
H3294 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
S2167 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2232 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1197 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
H4348 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
H1954 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
S2193 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H602 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4204.pdf |