MA H4198 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of tax bills in the town of Hatfield
Title
Relative to the issuance of tax bills in the town of Hatfield
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2764 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1618 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3318 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2764 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1618 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3318 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4198 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4198.pdf |