MA H4187 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3740

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the licensing authority of the town of Natick to establish minimum seating capacity for granting licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages or wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the licensing authority of the town of Natick to establish minimum seating capacity for granting licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages or wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-18HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-12-18HouseRules suspended
2023-12-18HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-11-20HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-11-20HouseNew draft of H3740
2023-11-20HouseReported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3740 (Replaces) 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4187
H3996 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4865
H355 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
H4865 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback