MA H4181 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3030

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To prevent jaywalking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent jaywalking

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-12HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-11-12HouseRules suspended
2019-11-12HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-11-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-11-07HouseNew draft of H3030
2019-11-07HouseReported from the committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3030 (Replaces) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4181
S1048 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2040 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3362 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback