MA H4178 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a municipal broadband development fund. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to assuring a jumpstart in investments in telecoms to preserve access to the internet

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24JointHearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2022-01-12JointHearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-09-30SenateSenate concurred
2021-09-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H139 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H141 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2137 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H137 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S58 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S56 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback