MA H4170 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public pension fund divestment from climate risk investments and negative economic impacts from carbon producing industries. Public Service.
Title
To mandate the review of climate risk in order to protect public pension beneficiaries and taxpayers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5206 |
2021-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S501 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5206 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5206 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4170 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4170.pdf |