MA H4164 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Amended by substitution of bill, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Amended by substitution of bill, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to accidental disability retirement benefits for Thomas Romeo, a retired police officer of the town of North Reading. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting Thomas Romeo from the 75% pension and annuity limitation for police officers hired after January 1, 1988 set forth in Chapter 32, Section 7(2)(a)(ii) of the General Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Amended by substitution of bill, see H4437 |
2024-02-22 | House | Read third |
2024-02-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-10-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2023-10-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4437 (Replaced by) 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4164 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4164.pdf |