MA H4161 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To rename the Massachusetts Rehabilitation Commission, Massability, to reflect the self-determination and limitless possibilities of people with disabilities
Title
To rename the Massachusetts Rehabilitation Commission, Massability, to reflect the self-determination and limitless possibilities of people with disabilities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | New draft substituted, see H4528 |
2024-04-03 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2024-04-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2024-04-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4528 |
2024-01-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-11-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4528 (Replaced by) 2024-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4161 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4161.pdf |