MA H416 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further regulating gaming licenses. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve the economy of the commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30SenateSenate concurred
2024-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-05-05JointHearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 02:00 PM-04:30 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H4490 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2712 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4607 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - See H4255
H4602 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4840 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback