MA H4121 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a pulmonary hypertension task force. Public Health.
Title
Establishing a pulmonary hypertension task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-08-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-04-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2016 from 12:30 PM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4121 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4121.pdf |