MA H411 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4593

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative González of Springfield, a petition of Carlos González and others that certain state grants target minority communities and businesses. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state grants targeting minority communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4593
2023-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H4593 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback