MA H4045 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-23)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a comprehensive statewide policy concerning streaming entertainment services and the recovery of municipal costs for the management and maintenance of digital infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to digital entertainment on public rights of way

Sponsors

Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Donald Wong [R]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]
Sen. John Keenan [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Barry Finegold [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. David Decoste [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Paul Frost [R]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Rep. William Straus [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2020-01-07JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-08-12SenateSenate concurred
2019-08-08HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
2019-08-05HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S1976 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2811 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2914 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback