MA H4037 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Accompanied S2326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Accompanied S2326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Andover be authorized to transfer the care, custody and control of a certain parcel of land in said town currently used as a cemetery and burial place to the board of selectmen for the purpose of conveying the parcel to J&J Ball Realty Trust. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
For Andover burial ground land transfer
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Accompanied S2326 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-08-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4009 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H3698 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4545
S2326 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2020
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2708 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1334 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1897 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1847 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H3698 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4545
S2326 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2020
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2708 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1334 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1897 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1847 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4037 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4037.pdf |