MA H3998 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4386

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Holliston be authorized to continue the employment of Mark Dellicker as deputy fire chief of said town notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Holliston to continue the employment of Mark Dellicker as deputy fire chief until a maximum age of 70

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-01 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2024
2024-03-28SenateRe-enacted and again laid before the Governor
2024-03-28HouseRe-enacted
2024-03-25SenateGovernors amendment adopted, in concurrence
2024-03-25SenateRules suspended
2024-03-18HouseGovernor's amendment adopted
2024-03-18HouseGovernor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading)
2024-02-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2024-02-15HouseFor message, see H4386
2024-02-15 Governor returned to the House with amendment
2024-01-29SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2024-01-29HouseEnacted
2024-01-25SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2024-01-25SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2023-12-28SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2023-12-26HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-12-14HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-12-14HouseRules suspended
2023-12-14HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-11-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-08-09JointHearing scheduled for 08/14/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2023-07-20SenateSenate concurred
2023-07-17HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4386 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - See H3998
H3826 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2024
H4176 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4867
H4867 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback