MA H3996 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Milford be authorized to eliminate the requirement for the Milford Geriatric Authority to make payments to said town in lieu of taxes. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Eliminating the requirement for the geriatric authority to make payment to the town of Milford in lieu of taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3993 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H698 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2019
H320 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3940
H319 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3939
H3939 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2019
H4141 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2019
H698 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2019
H320 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3940
H319 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3939
H3939 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2019
H4141 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3996 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3996.pdf |