MA H3995 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3729
Note: Legislation replaced by H4062
Note: Legislation replaced by H4062
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on July 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-17 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-17 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting the town of Wakefield to convey an easement to the Wakefield Municipal Gas & Light Department
Title
Permitting the town of Wakefield to convey an easement to the Wakefield Municipal Gas & Light Department
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government | Rep. Donald Wong [R] | Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-17 | House | Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4062 |
2023-08-17 | House | Read third |
2023-07-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-07-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-07-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-17 | House | New draft of H3729 |
2023-07-17 | House | Reported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3729 (Replaces) 2023-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3995
H4062 (Replaced by) 2023-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2023
H4062 (Replaced by) 2023-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3995 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3995.pdf |