MA H3978 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the appointment and management of the town treasurer of the town of Arlington. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the town manager act of the town of Arlington relative to the appointment and management of the town treasurer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-15HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-08-15HouseRules suspended
2019-08-15HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-08-12HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-07-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-07-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback