MA H3966 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-06 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Maria Jette, an employee of the Department of Mental Health. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Maria Jette, an employee of the Department of Mental Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-06SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-11-02HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-11-01HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-11-01HouseRules suspended
2017-11-01HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-10-26HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-10-19SenateSenate concurred
2017-10-16HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2776 (Similar To) 2017-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2017
H3723 (Similar To) 2017-07-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2017
H3922 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2017
H3949 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H1371 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Senate concurred
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
H3990 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback