MA H3964 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the minimum percentage of kilowatt-hours sales to end-use customers by retail electricity suppliers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Promoting renewable energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-12-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H3387 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H159 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H1826 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
S1666 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2153 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S1577 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H1384 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H616 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H3387 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H159 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H1826 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
S1666 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2153 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S1577 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H1384 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H616 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3964 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3964.pdf |