MA H3962 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4517

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide equitable sentencing for felony and joint venture murder. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding joint venture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4517
2023-07-19JointHearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-07-06SenateSenate concurred
2023-07-03HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3718 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H4032 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4353 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4543 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback