MA H3962 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1013
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to defense against abusive waivers
Title
Relative to defense against abusive waivers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-10-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-19 | House | New draft of H1013 |
2017-10-19 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1013 (Replaces) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3962
H784 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
H769 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2658 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2018
S2186 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H784 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
H769 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2658 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2018
S2186 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3962 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3962.pdf |