MA H3960 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Sandra Cuthbert, an employee of the Massachusetts Maritime Academy. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Sandra Cuthbert, an employee of the Massachusetts Maritime Academy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-18HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2019-07-15HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-07-15HouseRules suspended
2019-07-15HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-07-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-07-03SenateSenate concurred
2019-07-02HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2019-07-01HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3849 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3952 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3816 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3913 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2019
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback