MA H3951 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge on Morton Street in the city of Lowell as the Gentz brothers Memorial Bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the city of Lowell as the Gentz Brothers Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-08-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-08-06 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-11 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2012-07-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-23 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Transportation |
2012-05-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-23 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-01-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
2011-09-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3951 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17281&generalCourtId=1 |