MA H3936 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Adopted, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Adopted, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to driver’s license suspensions for drug offenses. January 6, 2016.
Title
Resolutions A RESOLUTION RELATIVE TO DRIVER’S LICENSE SUSPENSIONS FOR DRUG OFFENSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Adopted, as amended |
2016-03-24 | House | Amendment adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2016-01-06 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-06 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H613 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H2180 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H273 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4181
H762 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
H3100 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2180 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H273 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4181
H762 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
H3100 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3936 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3936.pdf |