MA H3917 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4593

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a blockchain-based limited liability company. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to establishing a BBLLC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4593
2023-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-06-20SenateSenate concurred
2023-06-15HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4593 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback