MA H3912 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mrs. Haddad of Somerset, a petition (subject to Joint Rules 12 and 7A) of Patricia A. Haddad that the Bristol County Retirement Board be authorized to grant creditable service to Christopher R. Carreiro. Public Service.
Title
Directing the Bristol County Retirement Board to grant creditable service to Christopher R. Carreiro
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-08-06 | House | Enacted |
2020-08-06 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2020-07-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-07-24 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2020-07-24 | Senate | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3912 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3912.pdf |