MA H3903 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Northborough be authorized to amend the charter of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the charter of the town of Northborough

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-28 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2023
2023-11-27SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2023-11-27HouseEnacted
2023-11-22SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-11-22SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2023-11-06SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2023-11-02HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-10-12HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-10-12HouseRules suspended
2023-10-12HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-09-25HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-07-11JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-06-12SenateSenate concurred
2023-06-08HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3997 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2024
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
H4086 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2523 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4509 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback