MA H3879 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H228
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for provisional licensure for speech-language pathologists
Title
Providing for provisional licensure for speech-language pathologists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-12-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-12-03 | House | New draft of H228 |
2015-12-03 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H228 (Replaces) 2015-12-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3879
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3879 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3879.pdf |