MA H3875 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to insurance coverage of medicinal cannabis. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance coverage of medicinal cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-06-13SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1110 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H947 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S613 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H945 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S711 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback