MA H3868 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Mary Goddard, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Mary Goddard, an employee of the Department of Correction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2018
2018-04-11SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-04-11HouseEnacted
2018-04-11SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-04-11HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-04-09SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2018-04-09SenateRules suspended
2018-04-09SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass
2018-02-12SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-02-07HousePassed to be engrossed
2018-02-07HouseAmendment 1 adopted, as changed
2018-02-07HouseRead third
2017-08-17HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-08-17HouseRules suspended
2017-08-17HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-08-14HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-08-03SenateSenate concurred
2017-07-31HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2577 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1419 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2557 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3923 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3949
H3924 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3943
H3922 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2017
H3929 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3943 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3947 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2018
H3945 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2017
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
S2111 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2017
H3949 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4354 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H4452 (Similar To) 2018-09-20 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback