MA H3867 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4713

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to community college tuition for graduates of Brockton public schools. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to community college tuition for graduates of Brockton public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4713
2023-10-03JointHearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1
2023-07-12JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-22SenateSenate concurred
2023-05-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H4713 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback