MA H3853 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the form of representative town government in the town of North Attleborough. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the form of representative town government in the town of North Attleborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-05-23 | House | Enacted |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-03-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3853 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3853.pdf |