MA H3847 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-04 - Approved by the people at the state election, Chapter 504 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Unspecified Title: An Act repeal of 2013 gas tax indexing Initiative petition of Steven W. Aylward and others for the passage of An Act repeal of 2013 gas tax indexing (House, No. 3847).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal of 2013 gas tax indexing

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2014-11-04 Approved by the people at the state election, Chapter 504 of the Acts of 2014
2014-03-05JointHearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2014-01-14SenateSenate concurred
2014-01-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Revenue

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback