MA H3843 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to workplace bullying, mobbing and harassment. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to dignity at work
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5233 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1185 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2816
S1200 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
S2723 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5233 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1200 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
S2723 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5233 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3843 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3843.pdf |