MA H3843 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the death of patrolman Eugene Scanlon, Sr., of the city of Lawrence police department. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Confirming the classification of Lawrence police patrolman Eugene Scanlon, Sr.’s death on February 12, 1972, as killed in the line of duty providing any additional or retroactive benefits to his survivors as a result of the confirmation of the classification
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-11-30 | House | Enacted |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-11-06 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-10-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-10-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-10-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-07-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3843 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3843.pdf |