MA H3837 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4865
Note: Legislation replaced by H4898
Note: Legislation replaced by H4898
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4898
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4898
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to liability for release of hazardous materials. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to liability for release of hazardous materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4898 |
2022-06-13 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-06-13 | House | Reported on a part of H4865 |
2022-06-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4865 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4865 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4898 (Replaced by) 2022-06-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4898 (Replaced by) 2022-06-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3837 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3837.pdf |