MA H383 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the economic and regulatory impacts of fifth generation (5G) cellular mobile communications. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a 5G technology task force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-16JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback