MA H3814 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3820

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3820
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Sarah Kolb, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Sarah Kolb

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3820
2023-05-01SenateSenate concurred
2023-04-27HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3820 (Replaced by) 2023-05-15 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4539 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4644 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4740 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback