MA H3810 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H888
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-08 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-08 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain loans by the Federal Home Loan Bank
Title
Relative to certain loans by the Federal Home Loan Bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-08 | Pocket vetoed | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-10-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-03-20 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-12-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-12-12 | House | New draft of H888 |
2013-12-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H888 (Replaces) 2013-12-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3810
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3810 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3810.pdf |